Hollway, Gordon John (CPSO#: 58736)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Apr 2005