Holman, Terry Gordon (CPSO#: 65244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Muskoka Medical Centre
230 Manitoba Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E1
Phone: (705) 646-7634
Fax: (705) 646-0476
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRY GORDON HOLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993