Holmes, Alan Ross (CPSO#: 54680)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
423 Colborne St East
Brantford ON  N3S 3N5
Phone: 519 756 1741
Fax: 519 756 2017
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

847 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L3B4
Canada
Phone: 9055445255
Fax: 9055445155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

25 Water Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y1P8
Canada
Phone: 5194261333
Fax: 5194261555
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Medical Records Location

Address: 40 Shellington Place Brantford ON N3S 0C5, 130 Wilson Street Hamilton ON L8R 1E2
Instructions: Patients who saw Dr. Holmes from 2010-2014 should send medical record requests to 40 Shellington Place. Patients who saw Dr, Holmes from 2014-2016 should write to 130 Wilson Street
Date Received: 25 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN ROSS HOLMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLMES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2006