Holmes, Allan Edward (CPSO#: 65949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1644 West 3rd Avenue
Vancouver BC  V6J 1K2
Phone: (604) 685-4747
Fax: (604) 685-4748

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Yukon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN EDWARD HOLMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLMES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1992 to 31 Oct 1992
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2003