Holmes, John Melburn Douglas (CPSO#: 21920)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 19 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Dec 1999

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1969
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 19 Dec 1999

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Nov 1999
Summary:

 On November 15, 1999, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Holmes guilty of professional misconduct 
 and ordered that his certificate of registration be revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 15, 1999