Holmes, Matthew Clinton (CPSO#: 77635)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300A - 984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 346-9747
Fax: (807) 346-4312
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Holmes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Holmes ( CPSO# 77635 )

Business Address:
300A - 984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 346-9747

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW CLINTON HOLMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLMES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007