Holmes, Oliver Edwin (CPSO#: 95101)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 29 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 2017