Holowachuk, Brian Michael (CPSO#: 68048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
594 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5K9
Phone: (519) 842-3636
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Holowachuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Holowachuk ( CPSO# 68048 )

Business Address:
594 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5K9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3636

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN MICHAEL HOLOWACHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLOWACHUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History