Holowaty, John Carl (CPSO#: 30735)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Sep 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Sep 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Nov 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Sep 1998