Holt, Ann Renee Elizabeth (CPSO#: 18911)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1961
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Apr 2002