Holt, Susan Claire (CPSO#: 31671)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jul 1996