Holtby, Stuart Gwynn (CPSO#: 50788)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 May 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Snoring & Sleep Centre
6453 Morrison St
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1
Phone: (905) 374-6453
Fax: (888) 905-6692
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

735 Goldstream Ave
Suite 125
Langford BC  V9B 2X4
Canada
Phone: 778-265-3383
Fax: 250-391-8400
County: 
Electoral District: 

MedSleep Prince George
226-100 Tabor Blvd
Prince George BC  V2N 3N5
Canada
Phone: (250) 596-1870
Fax: (250) 596-1875
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stuart Holtby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Holtby ( CPSO# 50788 )

Business Address:
Niagara Snoring & Sleep Centre
204 - 6453 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H1

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STUART GWYNN HOLTBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLTBY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1987