Holub, Roger Vincent (CPSO#: 58691)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 27 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004