Homik, Joanne Elizabeth (CPSO#: 57270)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 23 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 Jul 1988 to 19 Aug 1988
Other - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Aug 1988