Homuth, David Scott (CPSO#: 95750)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416 756 6001
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David S Homuth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Homuth ( CPSO# 95750 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6165

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID SCOTT HOMUTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOMUTH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013