Hondubrata, Linda Selamat (CPSO#: 85008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Indonesian

Education:UNIVERSITAS PADJADJARAN, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4
715 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone: (519) 624-2262
Fax: (519) 624-2263
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hondubrata Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Hondubrata ( CPSO# 85008 )

Business Address:
Suite 4
715 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7R1
Phone Number: (519) 624-2262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA SELAMAT HONDUBRATA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONDUBRATA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008