Hong, Angie Sungyee (CPSO#: 76384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
77 Provost Drive
North York ON  M2K 0B7
Phone: (416) 901-7407
Fax: (416) 901-9780
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hong ( CPSO# 76384 )
Dr. P. Shin ( CPSO# 76470 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Suite 8N-827A
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6840

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGIE SUNGYEE HONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Jul 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003