Hong, Collins (CPSO#: 54042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
302 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2N 1N5
Phone: (416) 222-6986
Fax: (416) 222-0955
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

80 acadia ave suite 108
Markham ON  L3R 9V1
Canada
Phone: (905) 477-3922
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Collin Hong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hong ( CPSO# 54042 )

Business Address:
302 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2M 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 222-6986

Business Address:
108 - 80 Acadia Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 9V1
Phone Number: (416) 222-6986

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLLINS HONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1985