Hong, Kim Edward (CPSO#: 21503)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Feb 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004