Honjo, Osami (CPSO#: 85905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:Shimane Ikadaigaku, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Cardiovascular Surgery
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6420
Fax: (416) 813-7984
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 12 Aug 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Osami Honjo may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division of Cardiac Surgery, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Honjo holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Honjo no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.