Honsinger, Philip Daniel (CPSO#: 86197)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone: (705) 746-9321
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.D. Honsinger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Honsinger ( CPSO# 86197 )

Business Address:
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 746-9321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP DANIEL HONSINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HONSINGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009