Hood, Robert Cameron (CPSO#: 50792)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 11 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011