Hoogeveen, Paul (CPSO#: 67004)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Simcoe Clinic
279 Yonge St.
Barrie ON  L4N 7T9
Phone: (705) 728-8860
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Georgian Bay Clinic
349 King St., Unit 3
Midland ON  L4R 3M7
Canada
Phone: (705) 527-4641
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hoogeveen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hoogeveen ( CPSO# 67004 )

Business Address:
The Simcoe Clinic
Unit 2
279 Yonge Street
Barrie ON  L4N 7T9
Phone Number: (705) 728-8860

Business Address:
3 - 349 King Street
Midland ON  L4R 3M7
Phone Number: (705) 527-4641

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL HOOGEVEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOGEVEEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995