Hoogstra, Jason Andrew (CPSO#: 70390)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
800 Commissioner's Road East
London ON  N6C 6B5
Phone: (519) 685-8525
Fax: (519) 685-8275
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hoogstra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hoogstra ( CPSO# 70390 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 6B5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8525

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON ANDREW HOOGSTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOGSTRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2002