Hooker, Glen Douglas (CPSO#: 67838)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Centric Health London Surgical Centre 310 Wellington Road South London, ON N6C 4P4
Date Received: 09 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2015