Hooper, Elizabeth Diana (CPSO#: 50793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leamington Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone: (519) 322-2501 Ext. 4417
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Hooper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Southcott ( CPSO# 110997)
Dr. J. Southcott ( CPSO# 31853 )
Dr. E. Hooper ( CPSO# 50793 )

Business Address:
Leamington Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 11 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH DIANA HOOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOPER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986