Hoornweg, Karen Lynne (CPSO#: 70149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brameast Family Physicians
Suite 38
2130 Northpark Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone: (905) 792-2211
Fax: (905) 792-2901
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Hoornweg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hoornweg ( CPSO# 70149 )

Business Address:
Brameast Family Physicians
Suite 38
2130 Northpark Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0C9
Phone Number: (905) 792-2211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN LYNNE HOORNWEG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOORNWEG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1998