Hoosen, Naushad (CPSO#: 80356)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fourth Avenue Medical Clinic
411 Louth Street
St Catharines ON  L2S 4A2
Phone: (905) 682-3692
Fax: (905) 682-7549
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2018


Corporation Name: Naushad Hoosen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Hoosen ( CPSO# 80356 )

Business Address:
Fourth Avenue Medical Clinic
411 Louth Street
St Catharines ON  L2S 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 682-3692

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAUSHAD HOOSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOOSEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2004