Hope, Andrew J (CPSO#: 87585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Wisconsin, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 5 - 606
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2124
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hope Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hope ( CPSO# 87585 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
5-606
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2124

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 18 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW J HOPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 26 Nov 2007
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2010