Hopgood, Derek Charles (CPSO#: 28612)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
747 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2A8
Phone: (705) 253-9671
Fax: (705) 254-1840
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek Hopgood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hopgood ( CPSO# 28612 )

Business Address:
201 - 747 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2A8
Phone Number: (705) 253-9671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK CHARLES HOPGOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPGOOD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1976