Hopkins, Denis Howie Galbraith (CPSO#: 16554)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1958
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 May 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008