Hopkins, Janet Jill (CPSO#: 62397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 28 Oct 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET JILL HOPKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPKINS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1991