Hopkins, M Laura (CPSO#: 69180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Gynecology Oncology
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8560
Fax: (613) 737-8828
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Hopkins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hopkins ( CPSO# 69180 )

Business Address:
Department of Gynecology Oncology
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8560

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. M LAURA HOPKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPKINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2002