Hopkins, Tammy Mary-Helena (CPSO#: 80835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
The 101 Mall
38 Pine Street North
Timmins ON  P4N 6K6
Phone: (705) 267-3272
Fax: (705) 267-4212
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Porcupine Health Unit
Sexual Health Clinic
169 Pine St South
Timmins ON  P4N 2K3
Canada
Phone: (705)267-1181
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Timmins and District Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-2131
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Timmins and District Hospital
Chronic Care and Rehab
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-2131
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMMY MARY-HELENA HOPKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPKINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 03 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007