Hopp, Marilyn Henderson (CPSO#: 26337)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 2000