Hopper, Richard Alan (CPSO#: 66786)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000