Hopyan, Julia Jasmine (CPSO#: 85935)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: Batmanian, Julia Jasmine (used until: 04 Mar 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of New South Wales, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neurology
Room A442
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4473
Fax: (416) 480-5753
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hopyan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hopyan ( CPSO# 69134 )
Dr. J. Hopyan ( CPSO# 85935 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neurology
Room A442
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4473

Business Address:
Division of Orthopaedics
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue S107
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7654

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 28 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA JASMINE HOPYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOPYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Feb 2007 to 06 May 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 07 May 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 12 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 11 Feb 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2009