Horak, Ladislav (CPSO#: 24877)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian, Slovak

Education:P.J. Safarika University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Horak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 19 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jun 2015