Horak, Martin John (CPSO#: 67984)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Horak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Horak ( CPSO# 67984 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5095

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN JOHN HORAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1999