Horen, Sheila Alexandra (CPSO#: 70638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Leamington and Area
Family Health Team
197 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N8
Phone: (519) 322-1100
Fax: (519) 322-2055
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Leamington District Memorial Hospit
194 Talbot St W
Leamington ON  N8H 1N8
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sheila Horen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Horen ( CPSO# 70638 )

Business Address:
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N7
Phone Number: (519) 326-2373

Business Address:
180 Riverview Drive
Chatham ON  N7M 5Z8

Business Address:
101 - 197 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N3H 1N8
Phone Number: (519) 322-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEILA ALEXANDRA HOREN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOREN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1998