Horgan, Anne Margaret (CPSO#: 87487)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2007 to 13 Oct 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 14 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011