Horgan-Bell, Caroline Bernadette (CPSO#: 56782)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
272 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 1S9
Phone: (519) 434-2193
Fax: (519) 434-9676
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Horgan-Bell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Horgan-Bell ( CPSO# 56782 )

Business Address:
272 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 1S9
Phone Number: (519) 434-2193

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 14 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE BERNADETTE HORGAN-BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORGAN-BELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987