Horn, Andrew Aitkenhead (CPSO#: 18883)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 15 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1957
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jul 1960
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1963
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 16 Nov 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Jul 1999