Horn, Edward Robert (CPSO#: 50795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University Complutense of Madrid, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6216
Fax: (613) 761-3602
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward R. Horn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD ROBERT HORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1993