Horn, Ruth (CPSO#: 33405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1001 Decarie Boulevard
Room E05:1832
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 934-1934 Ext. 35063
Fax: (514) 934-4476

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 12 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH HORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982