Horowitz, Daniel (CPSO#: 97537)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Jan 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:All Saints University of Medicine, Aruba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jan 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 28 May 2012 to 22 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 10 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Daniel Horowitz may practise medicine independently in internal medicine.