Horowitz, Gilad Israel (CPSO#: 104791)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tel Aviv University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2014 to 04 Nov 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 05 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016