Horri, Mehdi (CPSO#: 87715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Apr 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Apr 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200-1176 Nicholson Road
Estavan SK  S4A 2C3

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEHDI HORRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORRI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2007 to 17 Dec 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2007 to 24 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2008 to 24 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2009 to 26 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2015
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 24 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2017

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Sep 2016
Summary:

On September 26, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Mehdi Horri committed an act of professional misconduct in that he 
engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional, by having engaged in a sexual relationship with a patient too 
soon after the termination of the doctor-patient relationship.   
 
Dr. Horri, a 51-year-old family physician who practises family medicine in Saskatchewan, 
graduated in 1998 from the University of Tehran in Iran. He obtained a certificate of Independent 
Practice in 2015.  
 
Patient A was 23 years old when she became a patient of a family doctor, Dr. X, who diagnosed 
her with depression with suicidal ideation. Dr. X prescribed antidepressants to Patient A. During 
her third and final visit, Dr. X diagnosed Patient A with insomnia second to depression and 
found that Patient A did not presently have suicidal or homicidal thought process, prescribing her 
a different anti-depressant and sleep medicine. Following this appointment, Dr. X began a 
maternity leave.  
 
Patient A agreed to continue to attend for appointments with Dr. Horri, who was acting as a 
substitute during Dr. X’s leave.  
 
DOCTOR-PATIENT RELATIONSHIP 
 
Dr. Horri saw Patient A between January and June 2010, continuing the care plan commenced by 
Dr. X and providing Patient A with on-going support and medication management.  
 
Patient A describes that, because Dr. Horri was a medical professional whom she would not have 
to see again, she disclosed personal information to Dr. Horri that she had not previously 
disclosed to anyone. Dr. Horri provided Patient A with support for ongoing personal challenges, 
depression, anxiety, and sleep difficulties. Dr. Horri renewed prescriptions to Patient A for anti-
depressants and sleep medicine. 
 
During their appointments, Patient A recollects that when she would share with Dr. Horri details 
of her familial challenges, Dr. Horri would tell her that he could relate to what she was 
experiencing given his own experiences with his family of origin. 
 
POST-TERMINATION SEXUAL RELATIONSHIP 
 
Patient A’s final appointment with Dr. Horri in June 2010 was the termination of their doctor-
patient relationship. Following that appointment, Patient A dropped off a thank you note for Dr. 
Horri at his office. 
 
Dr. Horri looked up Patient A’s phone number in her medical. He called her to thank her for the 
card, to offer his ongoing friendship, and to suggest that Patient A call him if she needed a 
friend. 
 
Patient A describes that at his point in her life, she was fairly isolated from her support network.   
 
Dr. Horri and Patient A developed a friendship over the subsequent weeks. They met on a few 
occasions for coffee or walks together.   
 
Approximately two weeks after Patient A’s last appointment with Dr. Horri, Dr. Horri visited 
Patient A’s apartment. After watching a movie together, they had sexual intercourse.  
 
Patient A describes that she was scared and upset because they did not use a condom and she was 
worried about pregnancy. Dr. Horri left $200 on Patient A’s nightstand, which Patient A found 
highly insulting. Dr. Horri intended this as a supportive gesture. 
 
Dr. Horri left shortly thereafter for Thunder Bay where he entered the Family Practice 
anaesthesia program at the Northern Ontario Medical School.  
 
After his departure, Dr. Horri and Patient A continued an on-and-off long-distance intimate 
relationship for about three years. Patient A travelled to see Dr. Horri and Dr. Horri would 
sometimes travel to see Patient A. During and after the end of the sexual relationship, Dr. Horri 
provided Patient A with gifts, including two $2,000 e-transfers, a credit card in her name, and a 
laptop. 
 
Dr. Horri and Patient A remained in contact after the sexual relationship ended until the spring of 
2014.  
 
PENALTY 
 
On October 13, 2016, the Discipline Committee reserved its decision on penalty. On 
March 24, 2017, the Discipline Committee released its decision on penalty and ordered 
that: 
 
  1.     The Registrar revoke Dr. Horri's certificate of registration, effective immediately;  
          
  2.     Dr. Horri appear before the Committee to be reprimanded and the fact of the 
         reprimand shall be recorded on the Register; and 
   
  3.     Dr. Horri pay to the College costs in the amount of $10,000 within 30 days of the 
         date of this Order. 
       

On April 6, 2017, Dr. Horri appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Superior 
Court of Justice (Divisional Court). Pursuant to s. 25(1) of the Statutory Powers Procedure Act, 
the appeal operates to stay the decision of the Discipline Committee pending the outcome of the 
appeal.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing: September 26, 2016 Penalty Hearing : October 13, 2016