Horsey, Mary Elizabeth (CPSO#: 32169)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Record Storage & Retreival Service 111 St. Regis Crescent Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Instructions: call RSRS at 1.888.563.3732, or call the office number at 705.726.5453 for the next 6 months (end of Feb 2013)
Date Received: 29 Aug 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2014