Horsey, Michael William (CPSO#: 69880)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Fax: (613) 283-3515
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael W. Horsey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Horsey ( CPSO# 69880 )

Business Address:
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL WILLIAM HORSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORSEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1998